NY A00280 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to determining how candidates are placed on a ballot for separate elections of males and females.
Title
Relates to determining how candidates are placed on a ballot for separate elections of males and females.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.173 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.684 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5258 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.114 |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05258 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A280