NY A00267 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of elections to create a system to allow a copy of the candidate and contest information contained on each ballot style submitted by each county board of elections to be accessible to the public via web.
Title
Requires the state board of elections to create a system to allow a copy of the candidate and contest information contained on each ballot style submitted by each county board of elections to be accessible to the public via web.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.19 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 267c |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.124 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.124 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 267b |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | print number 267a |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04113 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS