NY A00263 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - amended on third reading 263b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - amended on third reading 263b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the imposition of penalties and remedies in suits brought for the vindication of civil rights or human rights; provides for reasonable attorney's fee and reasonable expert fees.
Title
Relates to the imposition of penalties and remedies in suits brought for the vindication of civil rights or human rights; provides for reasonable attorney's fee and reasonable expert fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 263b |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 263a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.17 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.90 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02170 (Same As) 2021-11-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN