NY A00261 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to submit an annual report detailing energy efficiency portfolio standard and approving programs.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to submit an annual report detailing energy efficiency portfolio standard and approving programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Senate | signed chap.5 |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-03-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-02-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.35 |
2011-02-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S215 |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-01-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-01-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.3 |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00215 (Same As) 2011-02-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A261