NY A00255 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes time restrictions for court issued consent orders for work performance to remove or remedy dangerous conditions or building code violations; permits sixty days for consent orders to be performed by an owner, mortgagee, or lienor of record and further restricts such person from using consent orders more than once.
Title
Establishes time restrictions for court issued consent orders for work performance to remove or remedy dangerous conditions or building code violations; permits sixty days for consent orders to be performed by an owner, mortgagee, or lienor of record and further restricts such person from using consent orders more than once.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.17 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-01-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.9 |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00350 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT