NY A00242 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing insurance coverage for medical marihuana.
Title
Relates to providing insurance coverage for medical marihuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08837 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means