NY A00237 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - amended on third reading 237a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - amended on third reading 237a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to public assistance employment programs for disabled persons.
Title
Relates to public assistance employment programs for disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 237a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.15 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.170 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01375 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES