NY A00209 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - approval memo.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Greenburgh, villages in the town of Greenburgh and the village of Sleepy Hollow in the town of Mount Pleasant to adopt a local law to impose a 3 percent hotel/motel occupancy tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Greenburgh, villages in the town of Greenburgh and the village of Sleepy Hollow in the town of Mount Pleasant to adopt a local law to impose a 3 percent hotel/motel occupancy tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31Senateapproval memo.22
2016-12-31Senatesigned chap.504
2016-12-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2016-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.1989
2016-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6872
2016-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2016-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2016-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-06-14Assemblyhome rule request
2016-05-19Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.631
2016-05-17Assemblyreported
2016-01-27Assemblyprint number 209a
2016-01-27Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2015-01-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06872 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A209A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback