NY A00111 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to publishing local campaign contribution limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to publishing local campaign contribution limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-05Senate3RD READING CAL.163
2019-03-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3140
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-02-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.11
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02427 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S03140 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A111

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback