NY A00108 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - amended on third reading 108d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - amended on third reading 108d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to arbitration organizations; requires private arbitration organizations involved in fifty or more consumer arbitrations per year to collect, publish at least quarterly, and make available to the public in a computer-searchable database certain information relating to such arbitrations; prohibits financial conflicts of interest.
Title
Relates to arbitration organizations; requires private arbitration organizations involved in fifty or more consumer arbitrations per year to collect, publish at least quarterly, and make available to the public in a computer-searchable database certain information relating to such arbitrations; prohibits financial conflicts of interest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 108d |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.630 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | print number 108c |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | print number 108b |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | print number 108a |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.37 |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |