NY A00050 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - advanced to third reading cal.587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - advanced to third reading cal.587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inspection and regulation of all electric and gas meters that measure usage of any end use customer of electricity or gas services by the public service commission.
Title
Requires inspection and regulation of all electric and gas meters that measure usage of any end use customer of electricity or gas services by the public service commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.587 |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.444 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00221 (Same As) 2012-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 221A
S00221 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
S00221 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS