NY A00046 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions allowing the Monroe county legislature to publish the pre-August first notice relating to the annual publication of list of lands charged with unpaid taxes, in one instead of two newspapers and reduce the number of times such notices need be published from thirty days to once a week for four successive weeks; permits the use of the preceding Friday instead of Saturday as an alternate publication date for the August fifteenth listing if the fifteenth falls on a Saturday or Sunday; permits the use of the immediately following Monday as the public auction date if August twentieth falls on either Saturday or Sunday.
Title
Makes provisions allowing the Monroe county legislature to publish the pre-August first notice relating to the annual publication of list of lands charged with unpaid taxes, in one instead of two newspapers and reduce the number of times such notices need be published from thirty days to once a week for four successive weeks; permits the use of the preceding Friday instead of Saturday as an alternate publication date for the August fifteenth listing if the fifteenth falls on a Saturday or Sunday; permits the use of the immediately following Monday as the public auction date if August twentieth falls on either Saturday or Sunday.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | reference changed to local governments |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |