NV SR7 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-29 - File No. 29. (Effective May 26, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-29 - File No. 29. (Effective May 26, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2023-2025 biennium.
Title
Designates certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2023-2025 biennium. (BDR R-1223)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-29 | Senate | File No. 29. (Effective May 26, 2023) |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | From printer. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Resolution read and adopted. To printer. |