NV SJR13 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - File No. 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - File No. 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the support of the Nevada Legislature for certain recommendations relating to the conservation of wildlife in this State. (BDR R-1000)
Title
Expresses the support of the Nevada Legislature for certain recommendations relating to the conservation of wildlife in this State. (BDR R-1000)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | File No. 37. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |