NV SJR10 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Senate. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging Congress to protect the public lands including and adjacent to Sunrise Mountain, Frenchman Mountain and Rainbow Gardens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Congress to protect the public lands including and adjacent to Sunrise Mountain, Frenchman Mountain and Rainbow Gardens. (BDR R-101)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2021-05-10AssemblyResolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate.
2021-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-08AssemblyResolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
2021-04-08AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-04-06SenateResolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-03-18SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-17SenateResolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback