NV SJR1 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR1A
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress to require the Bureau of Land Management and the United States Forest Service to include cheatgrass in certain forage estimates.
Title
Urges Congress to require the Bureau of Land Management and the United States Forest Service to include cheatgrass in certain forage estimates. (BDR R-257)
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 749 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 749.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR1 (Carry Over) 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)