NV SCR6 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - File No. 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - File No. 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning professional and occupational licensing boards.
Title
Directs the Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning professional and occupational licensing boards. (BDR R-520)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Senate | File No. 39. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Resolution read and adopted. To Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on Resolution File. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Preamble adopted. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Resolution read and adopted, as amended. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 999.) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Resolution File. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |