NV SB99 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; requiring each bill or joint resolution introduced in the Legislature to include a statement concerning whether the bill or resolution creates, generates or increases public revenue of the State or a local government; requiring the Fiscal Analysis Division of the Legislative Counsel Bureau to obtain or prepare a fiscal note for a bill or joint resolution that creates, generates or increases public revenue of the State or a local government; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes changes to provisions relating to fiscal notes. (BDR 17-700)
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Sen. Carrie Buck [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] |
Sen. Keith Pickard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7389/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB99.pdf |