NV SB99 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revising provisions governing sex offenders and offenders convicted of a crime against a child. (BDR 14-134)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revising provisions governing sex offenders and offenders convicted of a crime against a child. (BDR 14-134)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateVetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2017 Session)
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2015-05-31AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-30AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-28SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-28SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 915.) To printer.
2015-05-28SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-21SenatePlaced on General File.
2015-05-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2015-04-21SenateExemption effective.
2015-04-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-20SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2015-04-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 436.)
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-23SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-02-02SenateRead first time. To committee.
2015-02-01SenateFrom printer.
2015-01-30SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback