NV SB94 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 316.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the realignment of certain judicial districts. (BDR 1-758)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the realignment of certain judicial districts. (BDR 1-758)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-13 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 316.
2011-06-06 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-06-05 In Senate. To enrollment.
2011-05-30 Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2011-05-29 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-28 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-27 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-26 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-25 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-23 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-20 Read second time.
2011-05-20 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-05-20 From committee: Do pass.
2011-03-03 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2011-03-03 In Assembly.
2011-03-02 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2011-03-02 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-03-01 Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.) To printer.
2011-02-28 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-02-24 Read second time.
2011-02-23 From committee: Do pass.
2011-02-07 Read first time. To committee.
2011-01-26 From printer.
2011-01-25 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback