NV SB94 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to fire protection. (BDR 42-444)
Title
Makes various changes relating to fire protection. (BDR 42-444)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 828 and 839 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 828 and 839.) To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-09 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-08 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 35.) To printer. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=195 |