NV SB92 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Task Force on Alzheimer's Disease. (BDR S-270)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Task Force on Alzheimer's Disease. (BDR S-270)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | From printer. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |