NV SB92 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 541.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-485)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-485)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 541.
2015-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 11, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2015-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-31SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-31SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-31SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1035.) To printer.
2015-05-31SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-31SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-10SenateWaiver granted effective: April 10, 2015
2015-02-02SenateRead first time. To committee.
2014-12-22SenateFrom printer.
2014-12-20SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback