NV SB89 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the K-12 Public Education Stabilization Account. (BDR 31-65)
Title
Creates the K-12 Public Education Stabilization Account. (BDR 31-65)
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] | Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] |
Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Mark Manendo [D] | Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | From printer. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=195 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB89.pdf |