NV SB84 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 159.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 159.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to election precincts; changing the maximum number of active registered voters that may be included within an election precinct; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Increases the maximum number of voters in an election precinct. (BDR 24-532)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 159. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |