NV SB74 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 48-178)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 48-178)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 520.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateTo printer.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2017-05-26SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 919.)
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-11SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-11SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-10SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-10SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 71.)
2017-04-07SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-20SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-06SenateRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-23SenateFrom printer.
2016-11-17SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback