NV SB72 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the Merit Award Program. (BDR 23-239)
Title
Revises provisions governing the Merit Award Program. (BDR 23-239)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |