NV SB71 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Encouraging Parental Involvement Through Choice in Education Program. (BDR 34-413)
Title
Establishes the Encouraging Parental Involvement Through Choice in Education Program. (BDR 34-413)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | (No further action taken.) | |
2011-03-04 | Notice of exemption. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |