NV SB68 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public financial administration; revising provisions governing the investment of certain money held by the State; increasing the maximum amount of money the State Treasurer is authorized to transfer from the State Permanent School Fund to a corporation for public benefit to provide private equity funding to certain businesses; revising provisions governing the guarantee of bonds of school districts with money from the State Permanent School Fund; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing public investments. (BDR 31-399)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 54.) To printer. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |