NV SB68 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 497.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing professions. (BDR 54-290)
Title
Revises provisions governing professions. (BDR 54-290)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 497. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Assembly Amendment Nos. 756 and 962 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 962.) To printer. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 756.) To printer. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 65.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |