NV SB68 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to utilities. (BDR 20-497)
Title
Revises provisions relating to utilities. (BDR 20-497)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 256.) To printer. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | From printer. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |