NV SB60 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Fund for Renewable Energy, Energy Efficiency and Energy Conservation Loans. (BDR 58-410)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Fund for Renewable Energy, Energy Efficiency and Energy Conservation Loans. (BDR 58-410)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 315. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-06-02 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-02 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-05-31 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2011-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 832.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-15 | Notice of exemption. | |
2011-04-15 | To committee. | |
2011-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-14 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 40.) | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor, and Energy. To printer. |