NV SB554 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to transportation network companies. (BDR 58-1247)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to transportation network companies. (BDR 58-1247)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 582.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateRead second time.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-02SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-06-02SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback