NV SB553 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes and provides funding for the advance planning of the College of Engineering, Academic and Research Building and to complete planning and begin construction of a new building for the Medical School at the University of Nevada, Las Vegas. (BDR S-1244)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and provides funding for the advance planning of the College of Engineering, Academic and Research Building and to complete planning and begin construction of a new building for the Medical School at the University of Nevada, Las Vegas. (BDR S-1244)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 601.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1154 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-06-05AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1154.)
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateRead second time.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-02SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback