NV SB544 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to health care; creating the Patient Protection Commission; providing for the appointment of certain employees of the Commission; prescribing the duties of the Commission; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Patient Protection Commission. (BDR 40-1221)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateChapter 473.
2019-06-07SenateApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-27AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2019-05-27AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-05-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 863.) To printer.
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-15SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-05-14SenateWaiver granted effective: May 06, 2019.
2019-05-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback