NV SB543 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 624.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 624.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; creating the State Education Fund; revising the method for determining the amount of and distributing money to support the operation of the public schools in this State; establishing certain requirements for the accounting and use of such money; establishing requirements for the establishment of budgetary estimates relating to the public schools in this State; creating the Commission on School Funding and establishing its duties; establishing provisions relating to reports of expenditures by public schools; directing certain revenues to be deposited in the State Education Fund; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the funding of public schools. (BDR 34-1263)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 624. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1135 concurred in. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1135.) |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 986 and 990.) To printer. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |