NV SB54 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 456.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 456.
Summary
Revises the qualifications of the State Health Officer. (BDR 40-336)
Title
Revises the qualifications of the State Health Officer. (BDR 40-336)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 456. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-30 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-29 | To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 647 and further amend. | |
2009-05-22 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | Assembly Amendment No. 647 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Assembly Amendment No. 647 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 647.) To printer. | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=81 |