NV SB539 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 40-1217)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 40-1217)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 592.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-05AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateTo printer.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.)
2017-06-04SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1146.)
2017-06-04SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-06-04SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-06-03SenateRead second time.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Without recommendation.
2017-05-17SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-05-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback