NV SB538 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopts provisions to protect Internet privacy. (BDR 52-1216)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopts provisions to protect Internet privacy. (BDR 52-1216)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 570.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 982.) To printer.
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-12SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-05-11SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback