NV SB531 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Aging and Disability Services Division of the Department of Health and Human Services for deferred maintenance projects at the Desert Regional Center and for changing the information system platform for early intervention services. (BDR S-1195)
Title
Makes appropriations to the Aging and Disability Services Division of the Department of Health and Human Services for deferred maintenance projects at the Desert Regional Center and for changing the information system platform for early intervention services. (BDR S-1195)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1024.) To printer. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |