NV SB524 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations to the Division of Forestry of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for a projected shortfall for certain activities. (BDR S-1173)
Title
Makes supplemental appropriations to the Division of Forestry of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for a projected shortfall for certain activities. (BDR S-1173)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 228. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 721.) To printer. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |