NV SB523 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to making a supplemental appropriation to the Department of Education for an unanticipated shortfall in personnel services expenditures for literacy programs; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Department of Education for an unanticipated shortfall in personnel services expenditures for literacy programs. (BDR S-1248)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 5, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |