NV SB52 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to vital statistics. (BDR 40-446)
Title
Revises provisions relating to vital statistics. (BDR 40-446)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-04-26 | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-26 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2011-04-26 | Amend. No. 546 Adopted. | |
2011-04-26 | Action of adoption of amendment rescinded. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 85.) | |
2011-04-26 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-26 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |