NV SB515 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the financial administration of the Securities Division of the Office of the Secretary of State. (BDR 7-894)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the financial administration of the Securities Division of the Office of the Secretary of State. (BDR 7-894)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |