NV SB511 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Teach Nevada Scholarship Program and incentives for new teachers in certain schools. (BDR 34-1277)
Title
Establishes the Teach Nevada Scholarship Program and incentives for new teachers in certain schools. (BDR 34-1277)
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Roberson [R] | Sen. Ben Kieckhefer [R] | Sen. Becky Harris [R] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
Rep. Paul Anderson [R] | Rep. Marilyn Kirkpatrick [D] | Rep. John Hambrick [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer. |