NV SB508 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes an excise tax on sales of marijuana and related products by a retail marijuana store. (BDR 32-976)
Title
Imposes an excise tax on sales of marijuana and related products by a retail marijuana store. (BDR 32-976)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |