NV SB492 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-450)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-450)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 546.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1136 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-04AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.)
2017-06-04AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1136.)
2017-06-04AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-29AssemblyWaiver granted effective: May 29, 2017.
2017-05-27Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
2017-05-24AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-24AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-23AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 519.) To printer.
2017-04-21SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback