NV SB490 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to government contracts; requiring the Nevada Commission on Minority Affairs to conduct a study relating to disparities and unlawful discrimination on the basis of race or gender in the awarding of purchasing and public works contracts by the State or a local government; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Nevada Commission on Minority Affairs to conduct a study related to disparities and unlawful discrimination in the awarding of certain contracts by the State or a local government. (BDR S-586)
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] |
Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6947/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/SB/SB490.pdf |