NV SB49 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to emergency shelters for children. (BDR 38-498)
Title
Revises provisions relating to emergency shelters for children. (BDR 38-498)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 23.) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |