NV SB49 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the authority of a board of county highway commissioners regarding the establishment of certain rights-of-way. (BDR 35-341)
Title
Revises provisions governing the authority of a board of county highway commissioners regarding the establishment of certain rights-of-way. (BDR 35-341)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 71. | |
2011-05-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-14 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-04-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 250.) To printer. | |
2011-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-17 | From printer. | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |